PA HB1401 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-6)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, providing for volumetric severance tax; and making a related repeal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for volumetric severance tax; and making a related repeal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1401 PN 2610, MOT SPECIAL ORDER, STEPHENS (Y: 100 N: 92 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - House - House Floor: HB 1401 PN 2610, 2017 A4432, EVANKOVICH (Y: 53 N: 134 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2017-12-04 - House - House Floor: HB 1401 PN 2610, GABLER, MOT RECOM E R & E C (Y: 93 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2017-11-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1401 PN 2610, 2017 A4207, CUTLER (Y: 128 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-11-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1401 PN 2610, 2017 A4206, OBERLANDER (Y: 93 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2017-11-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1401 PN 2610, 2017 A4209, CUTLER (Y: 189 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-11-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1401 PN 2610, 2017 A4445, MENTZER (Y: 93 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2017-11-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1401 PN 2610, 2017 A4411, C. QUINN (Y: 74 N: 117 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2017-11-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1401 PN 2610, 2017 A4517, MARSHALL (Y: 93 N: 99 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2017-11-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1401 PN 2610, 2017 A4517, GERMANE, VITALI (Y: 98 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-11-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1401 PN 2610, 2017 A4190, OBERLANDER (Y: 85 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2017-11-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1401 PN 2610, 2017 A4190, MOT CONST, HARPER (Y: 98 N: 91 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-11-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1401 PN 2610, 2017 A4214, BENNINGHOFF (Y: 97 N: 95 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-11-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1401 PN 2610, 2017 A4214, MOT RECON, BENNINGHOFF (Y: 102 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-11-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1401 PN 2610, 2017 A4424, LAWRENCE (Y: 178 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-11-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1401 PN 2610, 2017 A4208, CUTLER (Y: 100 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-11-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1401 PN 2610, 2017 A4203, BENNINGHOFF (Y: 100 N: 91 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-11-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1401 PN 2610, 2017 A4651, OBERLANDER (Y: 51 N: 142 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2017-11-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1401 PN 2610, 2017 A4214, BENNINGHOFF (Y: 96 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2017-11-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1401 PN 2610, MOT MOVE PREV QUESTION, DIGIROLAMO (Y: 82 N: 109 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2017-11-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1401 PN 2610, 2017 A4531, MAHER (Y: 84 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2017-11-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1401 PN 2610, 2017 A4529, MAHER (Y: 191 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-10-18 - House - House Finance: Amendment Unconstitutional A04100 (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-10-18 - House - House Finance: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 9 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-10-18 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-18 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A04100 (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-25HouseRemoved from table
2018-06-25HouseLaid on the table
2018-05-02HouseRemoved from table
2018-05-02HouseLaid on the table
2018-01-23HouseRemoved from table
2018-01-23HouseLaid on the table
2017-10-24HouseRemoved from table
2017-10-18HouseLaid on the table
2017-10-18HouseFirst consideration
2017-10-18HouseReported as amended
2017-05-18HouseReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1401
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1401&pn=1762
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1401&pn=2610
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=10/18/2017&RollCallId=1017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=10/18/2017&RollCallId=1018
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=10/18/2017&RollCallId=1019
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=10/18/2017&RollCallId=1016
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=829
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=830
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=831
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=832
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=833
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=834
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=835
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=836
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=837
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=838
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=846
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=847
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=848
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=849
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=850
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=851
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=852
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=853
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=854
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=860
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=861
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=947

Bill Comments

feedback