PA HB140 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-8)
Status: Vetoed on November 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-17 - Veto No. 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on November 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-17 - Veto No. 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in rules of the road in general, further providing for additional parking regulations.
Title
In rules of the road in general, further providing for additional parking regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-11-15 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-11-15 - House - House Floor: HB 140 PN 3601, CONCURRENCE (Y: 108 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 140 PN 3601, Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 140 PN 3601, Reconsider vote by which HB140 received 3rd Consideration (Y: 21 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 140 PN 3333, 2021 A5837, LANGERHOLC Amendment No. A-5837 (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Adopt Amendment A05253 (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Floor: HB 140 PN 387, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A00291 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-11-15 - House - House Floor: HB 140 PN 3601, CONCURRENCE (Y: 108 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 140 PN 3601, Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 140 PN 3601, Reconsider vote by which HB140 received 3rd Consideration (Y: 21 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 140 PN 3333, 2021 A5837, LANGERHOLC Amendment No. A-5837 (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Adopt Amendment A05253 (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Floor: HB 140 PN 387, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A00291 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-17 | House | Veto No. 12 |
2022-11-17 | House | Vetoed by the Governor |
2022-11-16 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2022-11-15 | House | Signed in Senate |
2022-11-15 | House | Signed in House |
2022-11-15 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (108-89) |
2022-11-15 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2022-10-26 | House | Referred to RULES |
2022-10-25 | House | In the House |
2022-10-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (28-21) |
2022-10-25 | Senate | Amended on third consideration (28-21) |
2022-10-24 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-09-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-09-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-06-30 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2021-03-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-03-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2021-03-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-03-16 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-03-16 | House | Second consideration |
2021-02-05 | House | Removed from table |
2021-02-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-02-04 | House | First consideration |
2021-02-04 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-01-13 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |