PA HB14 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Pamphlet Laws Resolution No. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, further providing for courts to be open and suits against the Commonwealth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, further providing for courts to be open and suits against the Commonwealth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-24 - House - House Floor: HB 14 PN 1017, CONCUR (Y: 188 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 14 PN 1017, Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 14 PN 1017, Constitutional Point of Order to Amendment No. 0593 (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Floor: HB 14 PN 9, FP (Y: 187 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-20HousePamphlet Laws Resolution No. 2
2021-04-20HouseFiled in the Office of the Secretary of the Commonwealth
2021-04-19HouseSigned in Senate
2021-03-24HouseSigned in House
2021-03-24HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (188-13)
2021-03-24HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2021-03-24HouseReferred to RULES
2021-03-23HouseIn the House
2021-03-23SenateThird consideration and final passage (44-3)
2021-03-23SenateRe-reported as committed
2021-03-23SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-03-23SenateRe-reported as amended
2021-03-22SenateRe-referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2021-03-22SenateSecond consideration
2021-03-16SenateFirst consideration
2021-03-16SenateReported as amended
2021-01-28SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2021-01-27SenateIn the Senate
2021-01-27HouseThird consideration and final passage (187-15)
2021-01-27HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-01-26HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-01-26HouseSecond consideration
2021-01-25HouseRemoved from table
2021-01-13HouseLaid on the table
2021-01-13HouseFirst consideration
2021-01-13HouseReported as committed
2021-01-11HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=14
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0014&pn=0009
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0014&pn=0936
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0014&pn=1017
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0014P0009.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/SFN/2021/0/HB0014P1017.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0014P1017.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=01/13/2021&RollCallId=20
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=15
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=01/27/2021&RollCallId=89
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=03/16/2021&RollCallId=46
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=03/23/2021&RollCallId=89
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=03/23/2021&RollCallId=76
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=59
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=60
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=03/24/2021&RollCallId=228
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=102

Bill Comments

feedback