PA HB14 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-13 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-13 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 10, 1968 (P.L.316, No.154), known as the Legislative Code of Ethics, further providing for definitions, for prohibitions and for civil remedies.
Title
Amending the act of July 10, 1968 (P.L.316, No.154), known as the Legislative Code of Ethics, further providing for definitions, for prohibitions and for civil remedies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-17 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House Floor: HB 14 PN 162, FP (Y: 199 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House Floor: HB 14 PN 162, FP (Y: 199 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-13 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-06-17 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2015-02-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-02-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-1) |
2015-02-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-02-23 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-02-23 | House | Second consideration |
2015-02-11 | House | Removed from table |
2015-02-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-02-10 | House | First consideration |
2015-02-10 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-01-23 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |