PA HB1394 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Passed on November 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-11-23 - Act No. 109
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Passed on November 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-11-23 - Act No. 109
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 19, 1974 (P.L.973, No.319), known as the Pennsylvania Farmland and Forest Land Assessment Act of 1974, further providing for definitions, for split-off, separation or transfer of land and for penalty for ineligible use; and providing for removal of land from preferential assessment.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for split-off, separation or transfer of land and for penalty for ineligible use; and providing for removal of land from preferential assessment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-11-15 - House - HB 1394 PN 4467, CONCUR (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-10-13 - Senate - HB 1394 PN 4467, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-23 - House - HB 1394 PN 2211, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-17 - House - HB 1394 PN 2055, 2009 A1803, MAHER (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-10-13 - Senate - HB 1394 PN 4467, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-23 - House - HB 1394 PN 2211, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-17 - House - HB 1394 PN 2055, 2009 A1803, MAHER (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-23 | Act No. 109 | |
2010-11-23 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-11-17 | Presented to the Governor | |
2010-11-17 | Signed in Senate | |
2010-11-15 | Signed in House | |
2010-11-15 | House concurred in Senate amendments | |
2010-11-15 | Reported as committed | |
2010-10-18 | Referred to RULES | |
2010-10-13 | In the House | |
2010-10-13 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-10-12 | Re-reported as amended | |
2010-09-21 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-09-21 | Second consideration | |
2010-09-20 | Removed from table | |
2010-07-03 | Laid on the table | |
2010-06-30 | First consideration | |
2010-06-30 | Reported as amended | |
2009-06-26 | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS | |
2009-06-23 | In the Senate | |
2009-06-23 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-06-17 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2009-06-17 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-06-15 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-06-15 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-06-09 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2009-06-09 | First consideration | |
2009-06-09 | Reported as amended | |
2009-04-30 | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |