PA HB1388 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on December 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-15 - Act No. 58
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.682, No.284), known as The Insurance Company Law of 1921, in comprehensive health care for uninsured children, further providing for expiration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In comprehensive health care for uninsured children, further providing for expiration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-11 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1388 PN 1749, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS TO SENATE AMENDMENTS, RECONSIDERD (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1388 PN 1749, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS TO SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-20 - House - House Rules: Revert to Original Printer's Number 1749 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-20 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Amended with Prior Printer's Number 1749 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1388 PN 1749, CONCUR (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1388 PN 2633, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1388 PN 2599, A4543, WHITE AMENDMENT NO. A-4543 (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1388 PN 2599, REVERT TO PRIOR PRINTER'S NUMBER 1749 (Y: 19 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-10-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-18 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Floor: HB 1388 PN 1749, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-15SenateAct No. 58
2017-12-15SenateApproved by the Governor
2017-12-12SenatePresented to the Governor
2017-12-12SenateSigned in Senate
2017-12-12SenateSigned in House
2017-12-11SenateSenate concurred in House amendments to Senate amendments (43-6)
2017-12-11SenateVote by which Senate concurred in House amendments to Senate amendments reconsidered
2017-12-11SenateSenate concurred in House amendments to Senate amendments (42-7)
2017-12-11SenateRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2017-12-11SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2017-11-20SenateIn the Senate
2017-11-20HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments, as amended by the House (194-0)
2017-11-20HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as amended with Prior Printer's No. 1749
2017-10-25HouseReferred to RULES
2017-10-25HouseIn the House
2017-10-25SenateThird consideration and final passage (37-13)
2017-10-24SenateSecond consideration, with amendments (32-18)
2017-10-23SenateRe-reported as committed
2017-10-18SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-10-18SenateFirst consideration
2017-10-18SenateReported as amended
2017-06-13SenateReferred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
2017-06-07SenateIn the Senate
2017-06-07HouseThird consideration and final passage (194-0)
2017-06-07HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-06HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-06HouseSecond consideration
2017-06-05HouseRemoved from table
2017-05-22HouseLaid on the table
2017-05-22HouseFirst consideration
2017-05-22HouseReported as committed
2017-05-18HouseReferred to INSURANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1388
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1388&pn=1749
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1388&pn=2599
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1388&pn=2633
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=22&theDate=05/22/2017&RollCallId=420
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=423
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/07/2017&RollCallId=525
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=37&theDate=10/18/2017&RollCallId=490
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/23/2017&RollCallId=508
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=320
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=311
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=312
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=828
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=11/20/2017&RollCallId=1083
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=11/20/2017&RollCallId=1082
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=354
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=357
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=12/11/2017&RollCallId=561

Bill Comments

feedback