PA HB1385 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on September 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-06 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-06 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating the entire length of State Route 4010 in North Branch Township, Wyoming County, as the Joyce Maureen Steele Memorial Highway.
Title
Designating the entire length of State Route 4010 in North Branch Township, Wyoming County, as the Joyce Maureen Steele Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Boback [R] | Rep. Susan Helm [R] | Rep. David Millard [R] | Rep. Stephen Kinsey [D] |
Rep. Ryan Warner [R] | Rep. Ed Neilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-29 - House - House Floor: HB 1385 PN 1499, FP (Y: 198 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-06 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2021-09-29 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-09-29 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-1) |
2021-09-29 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-09-28 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-09-28 | House | Second consideration |
2021-09-27 | House | Removed from table |
2021-09-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-08 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2021-06-08 | House | First consideration |
2021-06-08 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-05-11 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |