PA HB1385 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-24 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-24 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in personal income tax, further providing for classes of income.
Title
In personal income tax, further providing for classes of income.
Sponsors
Rep. Brett Miller [R] | Rep. Duane Milne [R] | Rep. David Zimmerman [R] | Rep. Eli Evankovich [R] |
Rep. Aaron Kaufer [R] | Rep. David Hickernell [R] | Rep. Stephen Bloom [R] | Rep. Mark Rozzi [D] |
Rep. Jack Rader [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A02004 (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A02004 (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-10-24 | House | Removed from table |
2017-09-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-09-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-20 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2017-06-20 | House | First consideration |
2017-06-20 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-05-18 | House | Referred to FINANCE |