PA HB1379 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-10-22 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act repealing the act of June 22, 1935 (P.L.446, No.187), referred to as the Sunday Polo Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repealing the act of June 22, 1935 (P.L.446, No.187), referred to as the Sunday Polo Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-10-22 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1379 PN 1670, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-22SenateFirst consideration
2019-10-22SenateReported as committed
2019-06-20SenateReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2019-06-18SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-18HouseThird consideration and final passage (200-0)
2019-06-18HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-17HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-17HouseSecond consideration
2019-06-12HouseRemoved from table
2019-05-14HouseLaid on the table
2019-05-14HouseFirst consideration
2019-05-14HouseReported as committed
2019-05-01HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1379
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1379&pn=1670
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=05/14/2019&RollCallId=556
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=485
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/18/2019&RollCallId=835
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=15&theDate=10/22/2019&RollCallId=543

Bill Comments

feedback