PA HB1378 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-28 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-28 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a portion of State Route 2040, also known as Lebanon Church Road, between Pennsylvania Route 885 in West Mifflin Borough and Pennsylvania Route 51 in Pleasant Hills Borough, Allegheny County, as the Richard D. Olasz Memorial Highway.
Title
Designating a portion of State Route 2040, also known as Lebanon Church Road, between Pennsylvania Route 885 in West Mifflin Borough and Pennsylvania Route 51 in Pleasant Hills Borough, Allegheny County, as the Richard D. Olasz Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-28 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-09-28 | House | Second consideration |
2021-09-27 | House | Removed from table |
2021-09-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-08 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2021-06-08 | House | First consideration |
2021-06-08 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-05-10 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |