PA HB137 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-12-26 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 14, 1972 (P.L.233, No.64), known as The Controlled Substance, Drug, Device and Cosmetic Act, further providing for drug overdose response immunity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for drug overdose response immunity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-12-17 - House - House Floor: HB 137 PN 2759, FP (Y: 122 N: 72 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Floor: HB 137 PN 2759, 2019 A4080, ZABEL (Y: 82 N: 103 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2019-10-22 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03210 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-26SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2019-12-17SenateIn the Senate
2019-12-17HouseThird consideration and final passage (122-72)
2019-12-16HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-11-21HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-11-21HouseSecond consideration
2019-11-20HouseRemoved from table
2019-10-22HouseLaid on the table
2019-10-22HouseFirst consideration
2019-10-22HouseReported as amended
2019-01-28HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=137
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0137&pn=0130
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0137&pn=2759
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=10/22/2019&RollCallId=1226
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=10/22/2019&RollCallId=1228
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=927
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=12/16/2019&RollCallId=1519
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=982

Bill Comments

feedback