PA HB1366 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-11-19 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, adopting the Uniform Family Law Arbitration Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopting the Uniform Family Law Arbitration Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-11-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1366 PN 2412, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1366 PN 2383, 2021 A2944 (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A02811 (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-11-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A02873 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-19SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2021-11-16SenateIn the Senate
2021-11-16HouseThird consideration and final passage (199-0)
2021-11-16HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-11-15HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-11-15HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2021-11-10HouseRemoved from table
2021-11-09HouseLaid on the table
2021-11-09HouseFirst consideration
2021-11-09HouseReported as amended
2021-05-10HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1366
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1366&pn=1483
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1366&pn=2383
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1366&pn=2412
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB1366P2412.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=11/09/2021&RollCallId=1039
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=11/09/2021&RollCallId=1040
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=11/09/2021&RollCallId=1041
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=595
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=616
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=11/16/2021&RollCallId=1104

Bill Comments

feedback