PA HB1363 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-4)
Status: Passed on July 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-05 - Act No. 105
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-4)
Status: Passed on July 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-05 - Act No. 105
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, further providing for certain circumstances in which strikes are prohibited, for continuing professional development and for program of continuing professional development.
Title
Further providing for certain circumstances in which strikes are prohibited, for continuing professional development and for program of continuing professional development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-30 - House - HB 1363 PN 3837, CONCUR (Y: 151 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-06-30 - Senate - HB 1363 PN 3837, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-29 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-24 - House - HB 1363 PN 1604, FP (Y: 195 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-06-30 - Senate - HB 1363 PN 3837, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-29 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-24 - House - HB 1363 PN 1604, FP (Y: 195 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-05 | House | Act No. 105 |
2012-07-05 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2012-07-02 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2012-06-30 | House | Signed in Senate |
2012-06-30 | House | Signed in House |
2012-06-30 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (151-38) |
2012-06-30 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2012-06-30 | House | Referred to RULES |
2012-06-30 | House | In the House |
2012-06-30 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (39-10) |
2012-06-29 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2012-06-28 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-06-28 | Senate | Second consideration |
2012-06-26 | Senate | First consideration |
2012-06-26 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2011-06-26 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2011-06-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-06-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-1) |
2011-06-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-06-23 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-06-23 | House | Second consideration |
2011-06-21 | House | Removed from table |
2011-06-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-06-20 | House | Removed from table |
2011-05-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-05-04 | House | First consideration |
2011-05-04 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-04-25 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |