PA HB1354 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-14 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-14 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in general powers and duties of the department, further providing for State participation in cooperative Federal programs; in public assistance, further providing for income for the community spouse, for medical assistance payments for institutional care, for medical assistance payments for home health care, for other medical assistance payments and for medical assistance benefit packages and coverage, copayments, premiums and rates; providing for the Office of Independent Medical Assistance Director; and making an editorial change.
Title
In general powers and duties of the department, further providing for State participation in cooperative Federal programs; in public assistance, further providing for income for the community spouse, for medical assistance payments for institutional care, for medical assistance payments for home health care, for other medical assistance payments and for medical assistance benefit packages and coverage, copayments, premiums and rates; providing for the Office of Independent Medical Assistance Director; and making an editorial change.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 1354 PN 2151, FP (Y: 111 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Floor: HB 1354 PN 2151, 2017 A2434, FRANKEL (Y: 81 N: 118 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-06-26 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A02292 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 1354 PN 2151, FP (Y: 111 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Floor: HB 1354 PN 2151, 2017 A2434, FRANKEL (Y: 81 N: 118 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-06-26 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A02292 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-14 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2017-07-07 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-07-07 | House | Third consideration and final passage (111-79) |
2017-07-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-29 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-29 | House | Second consideration |
2017-06-29 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-26 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2017-06-26 | House | First consideration |
2017-06-26 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to HEALTH |