PA HB1353 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-15 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-15 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 51 (Military Affairs) and 71 (State Government) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Title 51, in employment preferences and pensions, further providing for military leaves of absence; in Title 71, in retirement for State employees and officers, further providing for definitions, for preliminary provisions and for membership, credited service, classes of service, and eligibility benefits, providing for State Employees' Defined Contribution Plan, further providing for contributions, for benefits and for administration, funds and accounts; and making editorial changes.
Title
In Title 51, in employment preferences and pensions, further providing for military leaves of absence; in Title 71, in retirement for State employees and officers, further providing for definitions, for preliminary provisions and for membership, credited service, classes of service, and eligibility benefits, providing for State Employees' Defined Contribution Plan, further providing for contributions, for benefits and for administration, funds and accounts; and making editorial changes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-15 | House | Removed from table |
2014-10-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-07-02 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-07-01 | House | Re-committed to HUMAN SERVICES |
2014-06-09 | House | Removed from table |
2013-09-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-09-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-25 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2013-06-25 | House | First consideration |
2013-06-25 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-05-17 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |