PA HB1351 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 1, 1933 (P.L.103, No.69), known as The Second Class Township Code, in auditors and accountants, further providing for surcharge by auditors; and, in township manager, further providing for township manager and appointment, removal, powers and duties and compensation and bond.
Title
In auditors and accountants, further providing for surcharge by auditors; and, in township manager, further providing for township manager and appointment, removal, powers and duties and compensation and bond.
Sponsors
Rep. Jerome Knowles [R] | Rep. Robert James [R] | Rep. Dan Moul [R] | Rep. Robert Freeman [D] |
Rep. Christina Sappey [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1351 PN 1466, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1351 PN 1466, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-25 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2022-01-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-01-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2022-01-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-01-12 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-01-12 | House | Second consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | Removed from table |
2021-11-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-11-10 | House | Removed from table |
2021-09-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-16 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2021-06-16 | House | First consideration |
2021-06-16 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-05-07 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |