PA HB1346 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-1)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known as the Liquor Code, in licenses and regulations and liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for wine expanded permits and providing for purchase of wine by license or permit holders from private wholesalers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In licenses and regulations and liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for wine expanded permits and providing for purchase of wine by license or permit holders from private wholesalers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1346 PN 1608, 2019 A1253, MACKENZIE (Y: 101 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1346 PN 1608, 2019 A1256, MASSER (Y: 108 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House Liquor Control: To Table (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-05-13HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-05-08HouseRemoved from table
2019-05-07HouseLaid on the table
2019-05-07HouseFirst consideration
2019-05-07HouseReported as committed
2019-04-29HouseReferred to LIQUOR CONTROL

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1346
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1346&pn=1608
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1346&pn=1805
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=298
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=299
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=28&theDate=05/07/2019&RollCallId=511
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=28&theDate=05/07/2019&RollCallId=515

Bill Comments

feedback