PA HB1343 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-11 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-11 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 2, 1993 (P.L.345, No.48), entitled "An act empowering the General Counsel or his designee to issue subpoenas for certain licensing board activities; providing for hearing examiners in the Bureau of Professional and Occupational Affairs; providing additional powers to the Commissioner of Professional and Occupational Affairs; and further providing for civil penalties and license suspension," further providing for civil penalties.
Title
Amending the act of July 2, 1993 (P.L.345, No.48), entitled "An act empowering the General Counsel or his designee to issue subpoenas for certain licensing board activities; providing for hearing examiners in the Bureau of Professional and Occupational Affairs; providing additional powers to the Commissioner of Professional and Occupational Affairs; and further providing for civil penalties and license suspension," further providing for civil penalties.
Sponsors
Rep. Harry Readshaw [D] | Rep. William Keller [D] | Rep. Daniel McNeill [D] | Rep. Mark Longietti [D] |
Sen. Judith Ward [R] | Rep. Dominic Costa [D] | Rep. William Kortz [D] | Rep. Bryan Barbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1343 PN 1662, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1343 PN 1662, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-06-06 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2018-04-11 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-04-11 | House | Third consideration and final passage (190-0) |
2018-04-11 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-04-10 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-04-10 | House | Second consideration |
2018-04-09 | House | Removed from table |
2018-03-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-03-14 | House | First consideration |
2018-03-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-05-05 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |