PA HB1332 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 43-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 6 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-11-10 - Second consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in terms and courses of study, providing for online curriculum availability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In terms and courses of study, providing for online curriculum availability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-10-18 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt Amendment A02575 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-18 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-06 - House - House Floor: HB 1332 PN 2241, FP (Y: 110 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-10-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1332 PN 1430, 2021 A2505 (Y: 110 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1332 PN , 2021 A2505, MOT RECON (Y: 164 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1332 PN 1430, 2021 A2505 (Y: 110 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-10SenateSecond consideration
2021-10-18SenateFirst consideration
2021-10-18SenateReported as amended
2021-10-06SenateReferred to EDUCATION
2021-10-06SenateIn the Senate
2021-10-06HouseThird consideration and final passage (110-89)
2021-10-06HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-10-05HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-10-05HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2021-09-29HouseRemoved from table
2021-09-28HouseLaid on the table
2021-09-28HouseFirst consideration
2021-09-28HouseReported as committed
2021-05-05HouseReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1332
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1332&pn=1430
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1332&pn=2241
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1332&pn=2272
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB1332P2241.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=09/28/2021&RollCallId=862
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=522
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=523
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=524
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/06/2021&RollCallId=934
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=534
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=23&theDate=10/18/2021&RollCallId=549
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=23&theDate=10/18/2021&RollCallId=548

Bill Comments

feedback