PA HB133 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-8)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-08 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-08 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing a bill of rights for individuals with intellectual disabilities or autism; and conferring powers and duties on the Department of Human Services.
Title
Establishing a bill of rights for individuals with intellectual disabilities or autism; and conferring powers and duties on the Department of Human Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-29 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-22 - House - House Floor: HB 133 PN 1753, 2015 A3148, SUSP RULES, EVANKOVICH (Y: 107 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2015-07-22 - House - House Floor: HB 133 PN 1753, 2015 A3144, MURT (Y: 178 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2015-07-22 - House - House Floor: HB 133 PN 1753, 2015 A2983, MURT (Y: 178 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2015-07-21 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-21 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - House Human Services: Adopt Amendment A01765 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - House Human Services: Adopt Amendment A01765 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-22 - House - House Floor: HB 133 PN 1753, 2015 A3148, SUSP RULES, EVANKOVICH (Y: 107 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2015-07-22 - House - House Floor: HB 133 PN 1753, 2015 A3144, MURT (Y: 178 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2015-07-22 - House - House Floor: HB 133 PN 1753, 2015 A2983, MURT (Y: 178 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2015-07-21 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-21 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - House Human Services: Adopt Amendment A01765 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - House Human Services: Adopt Amendment A01765 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-12-23 | House | Removed from table |
2015-12-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-12-06 | House | Removed from table |
2015-12-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-11-10 | House | Removed from table |
2015-11-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-09-29 | House | Second consideration, rescinded |
2015-09-29 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-07-22 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-07-22 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2015-07-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-09 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2015-06-09 | House | First consideration |
2015-06-09 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-01-21 | House | Referred to HUMAN SERVICES |