PA HB1325 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-10 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-10 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 8 (Boroughs and Incorporated Towns) and 11 (Cities) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in associations and organizations relating to boroughs, further providing for authorization and expenses; and, in city officers and employees relating to third class cities, further providing for Pennsylvania Municipal League and other municipal affairs organizations.
Title
In associations and organizations relating to boroughs, further providing for authorization and expenses; and, in city officers and employees relating to third class cities, further providing for Pennsylvania Municipal League and other municipal affairs organizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-16 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-11-10 | House | Removed from table |
2021-09-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-16 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2021-06-16 | House | First consideration |
2021-06-16 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-05-05 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |