PA HB1307 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-2)
Status: Engrossed on November 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-24 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-24 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in registration of vehicles, further providing for vehicles exempt from registration; and, in snowmobiles and all-terrain vehicles, providing for regional ATV pilot program for department lands.
Title
In registration of vehicles, further providing for vehicles exempt from registration; and, in snowmobiles and all-terrain vehicles, providing for regional ATV pilot program for department lands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-24 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Adopt Amendment A05699 (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-24 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1307 PN 1399, FP (Y: 120 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-24 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1307 PN 1399, FP (Y: 120 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-10-24 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2021-11-18 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2021-11-15 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-11-15 | House | Third consideration and final passage (120-79) |
2021-11-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-11-10 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-11-10 | House | Second consideration |
2021-11-09 | House | Removed from table |
2021-09-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-15 | House | Removed from table |
2021-05-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-05-24 | House | First consideration |
2021-05-24 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-04-30 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |