PA HB1306 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-1)
Status: Introduced on April 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-13 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-13 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in reimbursements by Commonwealth and between school districts, further providing for basic education funding for student achievement; and repealing provisions relating to accountability to Commonwealth taxpayers.
Title
In reimbursements by Commonwealth and between school districts, further providing for basic education funding for student achievement; and repealing provisions relating to accountability to Commonwealth taxpayers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-06-13 | House | Removed from table |
2011-04-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-04-13 | House | First consideration |
2011-04-13 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-04-07 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |