PA HB1305 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-17 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-17 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act repealing the act of April 2, 1963 (P.L.16, No.14), entitled "An act authorizing the Department of Highways, with the approval of the Governor, to construct a highway, and to erect and maintain a bridge over the Kiskiminetas River in Westmoreland and Armstrong Counties, and to provide the necessary approaches and connections with State highways; empowering counties to pay certain damages; and making an appropriation therefor."
Title
Repealing the act of April 2, 1963 (P.L.16, No.14), entitled "An act authorizing the Department of Highways, with the approval of the Governor, to construct a highway, and to erect and maintain a bridge over the Kiskiminetas River in Westmoreland and Armstrong Counties, and to provide the necessary approaches and connections with State highways; empowering counties to pay certain damages; and making an appropriation therefor."
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Pyle [R] | Rep. Aaron Bernstine [R] | Rep. David Millard [R] | Rep. Tina Pickett [R] |
Rep. Seth Grove [R] | Rep. William Kortz [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House Floor: HB 1305 PN 1525, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House Floor: HB 1305 PN 1525, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2019-05-07 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-05-07 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2019-05-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-05-06 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-05-06 | House | Second consideration |
2019-05-01 | House | Removed from table |
2019-04-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-04-30 | House | First consideration |
2019-04-30 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-04-25 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |