PA HB1305 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-17 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-17 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in high schools, providing for professional development related to secondary transition services.
Title
In high schools, providing for professional development related to secondary transition services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - House Floor: HB 1305 PN 1612, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - House Floor: HB 1305 PN 1612, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-17 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-01-29 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2017-05-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-05-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-0) |
2017-05-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-05-10 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-05-10 | House | Second consideration |
2017-05-09 | House | Removed from table |
2017-05-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-05-08 | House | First consideration |
2017-05-08 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-05-01 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |