PA HB1304 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-8)
Status: Passed on February 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-03 - Act No. 6 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-8)
Status: Passed on February 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-03 - Act No. 6 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 48382, on that portion of S.R. 4021 over the Stonycreek River, Hooversville Borough, Somerset County, as the Private First Class Howard Hahn Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 48382, on that portion of S.R. 4021 over the Stonycreek River, Hooversville Borough, Somerset County, as the Private First Class Howard Hahn Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1304 PN 1396, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1304 PN 1396, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1304 PN 1396, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Senate | Act No. 6 of 2022 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Signed in House |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-10-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2021-09-28 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-09-28 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-0) |
2021-09-28 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-09-27 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-09-27 | House | Second consideration |
2021-09-22 | House | Removed from table |
2021-09-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-15 | House | Removed from table |
2021-05-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-05-24 | House | First consideration |
2021-05-24 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-04-29 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |