PA HB1302 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-23 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: Senate Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-23 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: Senate Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 7, 1980 (P.L.380, No.97), known as the Solid Waste Management Act, in general provisions, further providing for powers and duties of the department.
Title
In general provisions, further providing for powers and duties of the department.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - House Floor: HB 1302 PN 1826, FP (Y: 199 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A01565 (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - House Floor: HB 1302 PN 1826, FP (Y: 199 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A01565 (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-23 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2021-06-23 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-06-23 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-2) |
2021-06-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-22 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-22 | House | Second consideration |
2021-06-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-15 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2021-06-15 | House | First consideration |
2021-06-15 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-04-29 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |