PA HB1294 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 1853
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of July 10, 1987 (P.L.246, No.47), known as the Municipalities Financial Recovery Act, in municipal financial distress, further providing for contents of plan and providing for municipal assistance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In municipal financial distress, further providing for contents of plan and providing for municipal assistance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-16 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A01709 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A01727 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-17HouseCorrective Reprint, Printer's No. 1853
2021-06-16HouseRe-committed to RULES
2021-06-16HouseFirst consideration
2021-06-16HouseReported as amended
2021-04-27HouseReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1294
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1294&pn=1385
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1294&pn=1842
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1294&pn=1853
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=06/16/2021&RollCallId=674
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=06/16/2021&RollCallId=675
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=06/16/2021&RollCallId=676

Bill Comments 750

feedback