PA HB1294 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 29-17)
Status: Engrossed on July 7 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-01-29 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in registration of vehicles, further providing for special plates for recipients of Purple Heart and providing for special plates for recipients of Legion of Merit; and, in lighting equipment, further providing for use and display of illuminated signs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In registration of vehicles, further providing for special plates for recipients of Purple Heart and providing for special plates for recipients of Legion of Merit; and, in lighting equipment, further providing for use and display of illuminated signs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-10-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 1294 PN 2013, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A01881 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-29SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2017-10-25SenateFirst consideration
2017-10-25SenateReported as amended
2017-07-14SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2017-07-07SenateIn the Senate
2017-07-07HouseThird consideration and final passage (190-0)
2017-07-07HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-29HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-29HouseSecond consideration
2017-06-29HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-14HouseRe-committed to RULES
2017-06-14HouseFirst consideration
2017-06-14HouseReported as amended
2017-04-27HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1294
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1294&pn=1590
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1294&pn=2013
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1294&pn=2647
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=06/13/2017&RollCallId=640
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=06/13/2017&RollCallId=639
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/29/2017&RollCallId=813
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=627
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=07/07/2017&RollCallId=843
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=10/25/2017&RollCallId=521

Bill Comments

feedback