PA HB1289 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-5)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-30 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-30 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 24, 1931 (P.L.1206, No.331), known as The First Class Township Code, further providing for removals, suspensions or reductions in rank of persons employed in police or fire force; and providing for certain incompatible offices.
Title
Further providing for removals, suspensions or reductions in rank of persons employed in police or fire force; and providing for certain incompatible offices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-11 - House - HB 1289 PN 1781, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 189 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-05 - House - HB 1289 PN 1686, 2009 A981, ELLIS (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-05 - House - HB 1289 PN 1686, 2009 A981, ELLIS (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-30 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-06-15 | First consideration | |
2010-06-15 | Reported as amended | |
2009-05-27 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT | |
2009-05-11 | In the Senate | |
2009-05-11 | Final passage | |
2009-05-11 | Third consideration, with amendments | |
2009-05-05 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2009-05-04 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-04-29 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-04-29 | Removed from table | |
2009-04-28 | Laid on the table | |
2009-04-28 | First consideration | |
2009-04-28 | Reported as amended | |
2009-04-20 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |