PA HB1288 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7)
Status: Passed on October 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-25 - Act No. 37
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in registration of vehicles, further providing for person with disability plate and placard.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In registration of vehicles, further providing for person with disability plate and placard.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1288 PN 1578, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Floor: HB 1288 PN 1578, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-25SenateAct No. 37
2017-10-25SenateApproved by the Governor
2017-10-18SenatePresented to the Governor
2017-10-18SenateSigned in Senate
2017-10-18SenateSigned in House
2017-10-17SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2017-10-16SenateSecond consideration
2017-10-02SenateRemoved from table
2017-07-17SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2017-06-21SenateFirst consideration
2017-06-21SenateReported as committed
2017-06-12SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2017-06-07SenateIn the Senate
2017-06-07HouseThird consideration and final passage (194-0)
2017-06-07HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-06HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-06HouseSecond consideration
2017-06-05HouseRemoved from table
2017-05-24HouseLaid on the table
2017-05-24HouseFirst consideration
2017-05-24HouseReported as committed
2017-04-26HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1288
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1288&pn=1578
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=05/24/2017&RollCallId=465
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=425
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/07/2017&RollCallId=524
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=06/21/2017&RollCallId=324
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=290

Bill Comments

feedback