PA HB1286 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-02 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-02 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 20, 2002 (P.L.154, No.13), known as the Medical Care Availability and Reduction of Error (Mcare) Act, in medical professional liability, providing for punitive damages study.
Title
In medical professional liability, providing for punitive damages study.
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Mentzer [R] | Rep. David Zimmerman [R] | Rep. David Hickernell [R] | Rep. Keith Greiner [R] |
Rep. Brett Miller [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-02 | House | Removed from table |
2018-10-02 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-06-11 | House | Removed from table |
2018-06-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-04-09 | House | Removed from table |
2018-04-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-12-04 | House | Removed from table |
2017-12-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-09-27 | House | Removed from table |
2017-09-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-06-29 | House | Removed from table |
2017-06-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-05-24 | House | Removed from table |
2017-05-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-05-23 | House | First consideration |
2017-05-23 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-05-22 | House | Referred to INSURANCE |