PA HB1285 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-11-07 - Vote by Electorate, See History, Section "o"
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, further providing for exemptions and special provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, further providing for exemptions and special provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1285 PN 1589, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1285 PN 1589, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-07SenateVote by Electorate, See History, Section "o"
2017-11-07SenateApproved by the Electorate
2017-07-17SenatePassed Sessions of 2015 and 2017
2017-07-17SenatePamphlet Laws Resolution No. 1
2017-07-17SenateFiled in the Office of the Secretary of the Commonwealth
2017-07-17SenateSigned in Senate
2017-07-11SenateSigned in House
2017-07-11SenateThird consideration and final passage (46-2)
2017-07-11SenateRe-reported as committed
2017-06-30SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-30SenateSecond consideration
2017-06-29SenateFirst consideration
2017-06-29SenateReported as committed
2017-06-21SenateReferred to FINANCE
2017-06-12SenateIn the Senate
2017-06-12HouseThird consideration and final passage (190-0)
2017-06-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-07HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-07HouseSecond consideration
2017-06-05HouseRemoved from table
2017-05-23HouseLaid on the table
2017-05-23HouseFirst consideration
2017-05-23HouseReported as committed
2017-04-27HouseReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1285
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1285&pn=1589
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=05/23/2017&RollCallId=422
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=458
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/12/2017&RollCallId=569
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=25&theDate=06/29/2017&RollCallId=372
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=251
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=07/11/2017&RollCallId=423

Bill Comments

feedback