PA HB1284 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-6)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 107
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for the Pennsylvania Business One-Stop Shop within the Department of Community and Economic Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for the Pennsylvania Business One-Stop Shop within the Department of Community and Economic Development.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1284 PN 3816, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1284 PN 3816, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 1284 PN 3121, 2017 A8703, SOLOMON (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Commerce: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A05731 (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-24SenateAct No. 107
2018-10-24SenateApproved by the Governor
2018-10-18SenatePresented to the Governor
2018-10-17SenateSigned in Senate
2018-10-17SenateSigned in House
2018-10-17SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2018-10-15SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-09-25SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-09-25SenateSecond consideration
2018-09-24SenateFirst consideration
2018-09-24SenateReported as committed
2018-06-29SenateReferred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
2018-06-25SenateIn the Senate
2018-06-25HouseThird consideration and final passage (195-0)
2018-06-25HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-06-22HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-22HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2018-06-11HouseRemoved from table
2018-06-11HouseLaid on the table
2018-04-09HouseRemoved from table
2018-03-12HouseLaid on the table
2018-03-12HouseFirst consideration
2018-03-12HouseReported as amended
2017-04-25HouseReferred to COMMERCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1284
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1284&pn=1561
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1284&pn=3121
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1284&pn=3816
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=6&theDate=03/12/2018&RollCallId=1273
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=6&theDate=03/12/2018&RollCallId=1274
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1422
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1448
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/25/2018&RollCallId=1863
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=31&theDate=09/24/2018&RollCallId=1088
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/15/2018&RollCallId=1204
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=734

Bill Comments

feedback