PA HB1280 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 3798
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for health insurance coverage requirements for stage four, advanced metastatic cancer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for health insurance coverage requirements for stage four, advanced metastatic cancer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1280 PN 1698, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A01175 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-21SenateCorrective Reprint, Printer's No. 3798
2017-05-31SenateReferred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
2017-05-24SenateIn the Senate
2017-05-24HouseThird consideration and final passage (190-0)
2017-05-24HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-05-23HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-05-23HouseSecond consideration
2017-05-22HouseRemoved from table
2017-05-09HouseLaid on the table
2017-05-09HouseFirst consideration
2017-05-09HouseReported as amended
2017-04-24HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1280
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1280&pn=1547
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1280&pn=1698
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1280&pn=3798
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=05/09/2017&RollCallId=364
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=05/09/2017&RollCallId=365
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=391
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/24/2017&RollCallId=458

Bill Comments

feedback