PA HB1277 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-14 - Third consideration and final passage (196-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in facilities and supplies, further providing for deposits into account.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In facilities and supplies, further providing for deposits into account.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-14 - House - House Floor: HB 1277 PN 1485, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-14HouseThird consideration and final passage (196-0)
2020-01-14HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-05-14HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-05-14HouseSecond consideration
2019-05-13HouseRemoved from table
2019-05-07HouseLaid on the table
2019-05-07HouseFirst consideration
2019-05-07HouseReported as committed
2019-04-17HouseReferred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback