PA HB1276 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-15)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Act No. 15
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-15)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Act No. 15
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in child protective services, further providing for definitions, for persons required to report suspected child abuse, for access to information in Statewide database, for release of information in confidential reports, for employees having contact with children and adoptive and foster parents, for information relating to certified or registered day-care home residents, for volunteers having contact with children, for continued employment or participation in program, activity or service, for certification compliance, for education and training and for mandatory reporting of children under one year of age.
Title
In child protective services, further providing for definitions, for persons required to report suspected child abuse, for access to information in Statewide database, for release of information in confidential reports, for employees having contact with children and adoptive and foster parents, for information relating to certified or registered day-care home residents, for volunteers having contact with children, for continued employment or participation in program, activity or service, for certification compliance, for education and training and for mandatory reporting of children under one year of age.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-30 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1276 PN 1997, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1276 PN 1997, CONCUR (Y: 190 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1276 PN 1947, MOTION TO BE GIVEN SECOND CONSIDERATION (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-28 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - Senate - Senate Public Health And Welfare: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1276 PN 1831, FP (Y: 180 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1276 PN 1686, 2015 A2003, KELLER, M. K. (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1276 PN 1686, 2015 A1983, MOUL (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1276 PN 1686, 2015 A2120, HILL (Y: 190 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1276 PN 1686, 2015 A1922, MAJOR (Y: 191 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1276 PN 1686, 2015 A2083, DAY (Y: 113 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1276 PN 1686, 2015 A2024, CONKLIN (Y: 176 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1276 PN 1686, 2015 A1974, CONKLIN (Y: 102 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1276 PN 1686, 2015 A2192, STEPHENS (Y: 181 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1276 PN 1686, 2015 A2192, SUSP RULES, STEPHENS (Y: 175 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1276 PN 1686, 2015 A1886, WATSON (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1276 PN 1686, 2015 A1885, WATSON (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1276 PN 1686, 2015 A1884, MOUL (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1276 PN 1997, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1276 PN 1997, CONCUR (Y: 190 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1276 PN 1947, MOTION TO BE GIVEN SECOND CONSIDERATION (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-28 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - Senate - Senate Public Health And Welfare: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1276 PN 1831, FP (Y: 180 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1276 PN 1686, 2015 A2003, KELLER, M. K. (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1276 PN 1686, 2015 A1983, MOUL (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1276 PN 1686, 2015 A2120, HILL (Y: 190 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1276 PN 1686, 2015 A1922, MAJOR (Y: 191 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1276 PN 1686, 2015 A2083, DAY (Y: 113 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1276 PN 1686, 2015 A2024, CONKLIN (Y: 176 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1276 PN 1686, 2015 A1974, CONKLIN (Y: 102 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1276 PN 1686, 2015 A2192, STEPHENS (Y: 181 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1276 PN 1686, 2015 A2192, SUSP RULES, STEPHENS (Y: 175 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1276 PN 1686, 2015 A1886, WATSON (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1276 PN 1686, 2015 A1885, WATSON (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1276 PN 1686, 2015 A1884, MOUL (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | House | Act No. 15 |
2015-07-01 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2015-06-30 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2015-06-30 | House | Signed in Senate |
2015-06-30 | House | Signed in House |
2015-06-30 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (190-5) |
2015-06-30 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2015-06-30 | House | Referred to RULES |
2015-06-30 | House | In the House |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2015-06-28 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2015-06-28 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-06-28 | Senate | Second consideration (49-0) |
2015-06-26 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE |
2015-06-18 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-06-18 | House | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 1849 |
2015-06-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (180-9) |
2015-06-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-16 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-06-16 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2015-06-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-08 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2015-06-08 | House | First consideration |
2015-06-08 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-06-02 | House | Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH |