PA HB1270 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-08 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-08 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge at the junction of State Route 150 and State Route 64 over Fishing Creek in Mill Hall Borough, Clinton County, as the U.S. Navy SOC David M. Collins Veterans Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge at the junction of State Route 150 and State Route 64 over Fishing Creek in Mill Hall Borough, Clinton County, as the U.S. Navy SOC David M. Collins Veterans Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1270 PN 1537, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1270 PN 1537, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2017-06-05 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-06-05 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2017-06-05 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-05-24 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-05-24 | House | Second consideration |
2017-05-23 | House | Removed from table |
2017-05-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-05-08 | House | First consideration |
2017-05-08 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-04-24 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |