PA HB1260 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-11)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - Act No. 94
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of August 26, 1971 (P.L.351, No.91), known as the State Lottery Law, in Pharmaceutical Assistance for the Elderly, further providing for the pharmaceutical assistance contract for the elderly needs enhancement tier, for board, for powers of the department and for coordination of benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In Pharmaceutical Assistance for the Elderly, further providing for the pharmaceutical assistance contract for the elderly needs enhancement tier, for board, for powers of the department and for coordination of benefits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-12-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1260 PN 2320, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - House - House Floor: HB 1260 PN 2320, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1260 PN 2192, 2021 A2699 (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A02371 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-22SenateAct No. 94
2021-12-22SenateApproved by the Governor
2021-12-16SenatePresented to the Governor
2021-12-15SenateSigned in Senate
2021-12-15SenateSigned in House
2021-12-14SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2021-12-14SenateRe-reported as committed
2021-12-13SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-12-13SenateSecond consideration
2021-11-09SenateFirst consideration
2021-11-09SenateReported as committed
2021-10-28SenateReferred to AGING AND YOUTH
2021-10-27SenateIn the Senate
2021-10-27HouseThird consideration and final passage (199-0)
2021-10-27HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-10-26HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-10-26HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2021-09-29HouseRemoved from table
2021-09-28HouseLaid on the table
2021-09-28HouseFirst consideration
2021-09-28HouseReported as amended
2021-04-21HouseReferred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1260
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1260&pn=1334
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1260&pn=2192
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1260&pn=2320
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB1260P2320.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/SFN/2021/0/HB1260P2320.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=32&theDate=09/28/2021&RollCallId=854
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=32&theDate=09/28/2021&RollCallId=850
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=541
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=553
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/27/2021&RollCallId=998
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=389
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=1&theDate=11/09/2021&RollCallId=647
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=12/14/2021&RollCallId=716

Bill Comments

feedback