PA HB1260 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-12 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-12 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act renaming the bridge on that portion of Township Route 431/436, Cooney Road, over US Route 22 in Munster Township, Cambria County, as the PFC Thomas A. Cooney Memorial Bridge.
Title
Renaming the bridge on that portion of Township Route 431/436, Cooney Road, over US Route 22 in Munster Township, Cambria County, as the PFC Thomas A. Cooney Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Floor: HB 1260 PN 1662, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-12-16 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-16 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Floor: HB 1260 PN 1662, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-12-16 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-16 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-12 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2016-02-08 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-02-08 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2016-02-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-01-27 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-01-27 | House | Second consideration |
2015-12-17 | House | Removed from table |
2015-12-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-12-16 | House | First consideration |
2015-12-16 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-06-01 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |