PA HB126 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-11)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 93
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in prescribing opioids to minors, further providing for procedure; providing for reimbursement of patient expenses associated with participation in cancer clinical trials and for duties of the Department of Health; imposing a penalty; providing for the use of epinephrine auto-injectors by certain entities and organizations; and conferring powers and imposing duties on the Department of Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In prescribing opioids to minors, further providing for procedure; providing for reimbursement of patient expenses associated with participation in cancer clinical trials and for duties of the Department of Health; imposing a penalty; providing for the use of epinephrine auto-injectors by certain entities and organizations; and conferring powers and imposing duties on the Department of Health.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 126 PN 4072, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS TO SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-01 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment A09192 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment A09476 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - House Floor: HB 126 PN 4072, CONCUR (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 126 PN 3814, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Floor: HB 126 PN 92, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-24SenateAct No. 93
2018-10-24SenateApproved by the Governor
2018-10-16SenatePresented to the Governor
2018-10-15SenateSigned in Senate
2018-10-09SenateSigned in House
2018-10-02SenateSenate concurred in House amendments to Senate amendments (48-0)
2018-10-01SenateRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2018-09-25SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2018-09-25SenateIn the Senate
2018-09-25HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments, as amended by the House (195-0)
2018-09-25HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as amended
2018-06-25HouseReferred to RULES
2018-06-22HouseIn the House
2018-06-22SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-0)
2018-06-22SenateAmended on third consideration
2018-06-19SenateRemoved from table
2018-06-19SenateLaid on the table
2018-05-22SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-03-27SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-03-27SenateSecond consideration
2018-03-19SenateRemoved from table
2017-07-08SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2017-06-13SenateFirst consideration
2017-06-13SenateReported as amended
2017-03-24SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2017-03-22SenateIn the Senate
2017-03-22HouseThird consideration and final passage (191-0)
2017-03-22HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-03-21HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-03-21HouseSecond consideration
2017-03-20HouseRemoved from table
2017-02-08HouseLaid on the table
2017-02-08HouseFirst consideration
2017-02-08HouseReported as committed
2017-01-23HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=126
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0126&pn=0092
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0126&pn=2004
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0126&pn=3814
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0126&pn=4072
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=02/08/2017&RollCallId=60
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=110
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/22/2017&RollCallId=165
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=33&theDate=06/13/2017&RollCallId=260
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=05/22/2018&RollCallId=863
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=628
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1463
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=09/25/2018&RollCallId=1951
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=09/25/2018&RollCallId=1950
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=09/25/2018&RollCallId=1949
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=10/01/2018&RollCallId=1138
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=664

Bill Comments

feedback