PA HB1252 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-01-26 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An act designating a bridge on that portion of U.S. Route 219 South, over U.S. Route 22, also known as the Admiral Peary Highway, in Cambria Township, Cambria County, as the PFC Nick Kozorosky Memorial Bridge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act designating a bridge on that portion of U.S. Route 219 South, over U.S. Route 22, also known as the Admiral Peary Highway, in Cambria Township, Cambria County, as the PFC Nick Kozorosky Memorial Bridge.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Floor: HB 1252 PN 2798, FP (Y: 184 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A04199 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-26SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2018-01-23SenateIn the Senate
2018-01-23HouseThird consideration and final passage (184-0)
2018-01-23HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-01-22HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-01-22HouseSecond consideration
2017-12-12HouseRemoved from table
2017-12-11HouseLaid on the table
2017-12-11HouseFirst consideration
2017-12-11HouseReported as amended
2017-04-19HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1252
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1252&pn=1496
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1252&pn=2798
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=12/11/2017&RollCallId=1159
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=12/11/2017&RollCallId=1158
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=964
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=01/23/2018&RollCallId=1224

Bill Comments

feedback