PA HB1252 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 15 2007 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 47
Status: Enrolled on July 15 2007 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 47
Summary
An Act amending the act of October 5, 1978 (P.L.1109, No.261), known as the Osteopathic Medical Practice Act, further providing for physician assistants.
Title
An Act amending the act of October 5, 1978 (P.L.1109, No.261), known as the Osteopathic Medical Practice Act, further providing for physician assistants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-07-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2007-07-15 | Presented to the Governor | |
2007-07-14 | Signed in Senate | |
2007-07-13 | Signed in House | |
2007-07-13 | House concurred in Senate amendments | |
2007-07-13 | Reported as committed | |
2007-07-13 | Referred to RULES | |
2007-07-12 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-07-11 | Second consideration | |
2007-07-10 | Re-reported as amended | |
2007-07-05 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-06-30 | First consideration | |
2007-06-30 | Reported as amended | |
2007-06-30 | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE | |
2007-06-26 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-06-25 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-06-21 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-06-21 | Second consideration | |
2007-06-20 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-06-19 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2007-06-19 | First consideration | |
2007-06-19 | Reported as amended | |
2007-05-08 | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1252 |