PA HB125 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-8)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Act No. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 1951, carrying State Route 4017 on Wetzel Road, Shaler Township, Allegheny County, as the Commander William J. Schofield, III, Memorial Bridge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 1951, carrying State Route 4017 on Wetzel Road, Shaler Township, Allegheny County, as the Commander William J. Schofield, III, Memorial Bridge.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 125 PN 92, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Floor: HB 125 PN 92, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-30SenateAct No. 28
2021-06-30SenateApproved by the Governor
2021-06-28SenatePresented to the Governor
2021-06-25SenateSigned in Senate
2021-06-25SenateSigned in House
2021-06-25SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2021-06-22SenateRemoved from table
2021-06-22SenateLaid on the table
2021-06-07SenateSecond consideration
2021-05-25SenateFirst consideration
2021-05-25SenateReported as committed
2021-03-18SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2021-03-16SenateIn the Senate
2021-03-16HouseThird consideration and final passage (202-0)
2021-03-16HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-03-15HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-03-15HouseSecond consideration
2021-02-05HouseRemoved from table
2021-02-04HouseLaid on the table
2021-02-04HouseFirst consideration
2021-02-04HouseReported as committed
2021-01-12HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=125
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0125&pn=0092
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0125P0092.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=02/04/2021&RollCallId=76
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=61
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/16/2021&RollCallId=164
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=05/25/2021&RollCallId=221
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=234

Bill Comments

feedback