PA HB1247 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-18 - Act No. 111
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-18 - Act No. 111
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing the release of Project 70 restrictions on certain Project 70 land situate in Piney Creek Springs, Woodbury Township, Blair County, owned by the Commonwealth in return for the imposition of Project 70 restrictions on certain land situate in Woodbury Township, Blair County, being conveyed to the Pennsylvania Fish and Boat Commission.
Title
Authorizing the release of Project 70 restrictions on certain Project 70 land situate in Piney Creek Springs, Woodbury Township, Blair County, owned by the Commonwealth in return for the imposition of Project 70 restrictions on certain land situate in Woodbury Township, Blair County, being conveyed to the Pennsylvania Fish and Boat Commission.
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Stern [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-12-09 - Senate - HB 1247 PN 1589, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-03 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - House - HB 1247 PN 1589, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-12-03 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - House - HB 1247 PN 1589, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Senate | Act No. 111 |
2013-12-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2013-12-10 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2013-12-10 | Senate | Signed in House |
2013-12-09 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2013-12-04 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-12-03 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-12-03 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2013-06-11 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-06-11 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2013-06-11 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-10 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-06-10 | House | Second consideration |
2013-06-04 | House | Removed from table |
2013-06-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-06-03 | House | First consideration |
2013-06-03 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-04-23 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |