PA HB1245 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-18 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-18 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 14, 1972 (P.L.233, No.64), known as The Controlled Substance, Drug, Device and Cosmetic Act, further providing for definitions and for prohibited acts and penalties.
Title
Further providing for definitions and for prohibited acts and penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-14 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2024-03-18 | House | First consideration |
2024-03-18 | House | Reported as committed |
2023-05-24 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |