PA HB1239 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-9)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-10-03 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in licensing of drivers, further providing for classes of licenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In licensing of drivers, further providing for classes of licenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1239 PN 1466, FP (Y: 191 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-03SenateRemoved from table
2018-10-03SenateLaid on the table
2018-06-18SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-03-19SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-03-19SenateSecond consideration
2018-01-31SenateFirst consideration
2018-01-31SenateReported as committed
2017-06-16SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2017-06-12SenateIn the Senate
2017-06-12HouseThird consideration and final passage (191-1)
2017-06-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-07HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-07HouseSecond consideration
2017-06-06HouseRemoved from table
2017-05-24HouseLaid on the table
2017-05-24HouseFirst consideration
2017-05-24HouseReported as committed
2017-04-17HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1239
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1239&pn=1466
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=05/24/2017&RollCallId=466
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=464
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/12/2017&RollCallId=568
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=01/31/2018&RollCallId=664
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/18/2018&RollCallId=983

Bill Comments

feedback