PA HB1236 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act regulating certain smoke alarms; providing for dwelling unit owner and tenant responsibilities; and prescribing penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulating certain smoke alarms; providing for dwelling unit owner and tenant responsibilities; and prescribing penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-14 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A04454 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-21HouseRemoved from table
2020-01-14HouseLaid on the table
2020-01-14HouseFirst consideration
2020-01-14HouseReported as amended
2019-06-05HouseRe-referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
2019-06-05HouseReported with request to re-refer to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
2019-04-17HouseReferred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1236
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1236&pn=1470
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1236&pn=3130
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=10&theDate=06/04/2019&RollCallId=614
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=01/14/2020&RollCallId=1588
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=01/14/2020&RollCallId=1591

Bill Comments

feedback