PA HB1234 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-18 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-18 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 2, 1915 (P.L.736, No.338), known as the Workers' Compensation Act, in liability and compensation, further providing for the definitions of "injury," "personal injury" and "injury arising in the course of his employment," providing for diseases with long latency periods between occupational exposure and manifestation of the disease and further providing for liability.
Title
In liability and compensation, further providing for the definitions of "injury," "personal injury" and "injury arising in the course of his employment," providing for diseases with long latency periods between occupational exposure and manifestation of the disease and further providing for liability.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Cox [R] | Sen. Cris Dush [R] | Rep. Jonathan Fritz [R] | Rep. Robert Kauffman [R] |
Rep. Ryan Mackenzie [R] | Rep. David Millard [R] | Rep. Eric Nelson [R] | Rep. James Rigby [R] |
Rep. Jeff Wheeland [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-11-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1234 PN 2813, 2019 A3909, SUSP RULES, KRUEGER (Y: 89 N: 110 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-11-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1234 PN 2813, 2019 A3649, MULLERY (Y: 96 N: 103 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-11-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1234 PN 2813, 2019 A3643, MULLERY (Y: 91 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-11-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1234 PN 2813, 2019 A3622, BRADFORD (Y: 91 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-11-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1234 PN 2813, 2019 A3624, BRADFORD (Y: 99 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-11-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1234 PN 2813, 2019 A3682, KRUEGER (Y: 91 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-11-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1234 PN 2813, 2019 A3660, MULLERY (Y: 96 N: 103 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-11-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1234 PN 2813, 2019 A3659, MULLERY (Y: 92 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-11-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1234 PN 2813, 2019 A3656, KRUEGER (Y: 96 N: 103 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-10-29 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A03292 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A03213 (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1234 PN 2813, 2019 A3909, SUSP RULES, KRUEGER (Y: 89 N: 110 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-11-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1234 PN 2813, 2019 A3649, MULLERY (Y: 96 N: 103 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-11-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1234 PN 2813, 2019 A3643, MULLERY (Y: 91 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-11-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1234 PN 2813, 2019 A3622, BRADFORD (Y: 91 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-11-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1234 PN 2813, 2019 A3624, BRADFORD (Y: 99 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-11-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1234 PN 2813, 2019 A3682, KRUEGER (Y: 91 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-11-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1234 PN 2813, 2019 A3660, MULLERY (Y: 96 N: 103 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-11-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1234 PN 2813, 2019 A3659, MULLERY (Y: 92 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-11-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1234 PN 2813, 2019 A3656, KRUEGER (Y: 96 N: 103 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-10-29 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A03292 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A03213 (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-18 | House | Removed from table |
2020-11-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-09-15 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-06-10 | House | Removed from table |
2020-06-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-28 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-02-03 | House | Removed from table |
2020-02-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-11-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-11-18 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-11-18 | House | Second consideration |
2019-10-30 | House | Removed from table |
2019-10-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-10-29 | House | First consideration |
2019-10-29 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |