PA HB1233 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-10)
Status: Enrolled on October 18 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-10-18 - Presented to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of July 9, 1976 (P.L.817, No.143), known as the Mental Health Procedures Act, in general provisions, further providing for scope of act, providing for definitions, further providing for treatment facilities and for individualized treatment plan and providing for assisted outpatient treatment implementation by counties and for assisted outpatient treatment implementation by department; in involuntary examination and treatment, further providing for persons subject, for involuntary emergency examination and treatment authorized by physician, for persons for whom application may be made, and for additional periods of court-ordered involuntary treatment; and adding provisions relating to assisted outpatient treatment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In general provisions, further providing for scope of act, providing for definitions, further providing for treatment facilities and for individualized treatment plan and providing for assisted outpatient treatment implementation by counties and for assisted outpatient treatment implementation by department; in involuntary examination and treatment, further providing for persons subject, for involuntary emergency examination and treatment authorized by physician, for persons for whom application may be made, and for additional periods of court-ordered involuntary treatment; and adding provisions relating to assisted outpatient treatment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1233 PN 4252, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1233 PN 4252, CONCUR (Y: 181 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1233 PN 2083, FP (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1233 PN 1838, 2017 A1992, MURT (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Human Services: Adopt Amendment A01406 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-18HousePresented to the Governor
2018-10-17HouseSigned in Senate
2018-10-17HouseSigned in House
2018-10-17HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (181-0)
2018-10-17HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2018-10-17HouseReferred to RULES
2018-10-17HouseIn the House
2018-10-17SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2018-10-16SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-10-15SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-10-15SenateSecond consideration, with amendments
2018-10-02SenateRemoved from table
2018-05-21SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2018-03-20SenateFirst consideration
2018-03-20SenateReported as amended
2017-06-22SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2017-06-21SenateIn the Senate
2017-06-21HouseThird consideration and final passage (189-0)
2017-06-21HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-20HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-20HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2017-06-19HouseRemoved from table
2017-05-24HouseLaid on the table
2017-05-24HouseFirst consideration
2017-05-24HouseReported as amended
2017-04-17HouseReferred to HUMAN SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1233
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1233&pn=1460
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1233&pn=1838
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1233&pn=2083
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1233&pn=3188
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1233&pn=4252
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=56&theDate=05/24/2017&RollCallId=460
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=56&theDate=05/24/2017&RollCallId=461
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=515
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=537
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/21/2017&RollCallId=701
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=33&theDate=03/20/2018&RollCallId=705
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/16/2018&RollCallId=1217
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1626
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=732

Bill Comments

feedback